SD HB1133 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require each school district to adopt a policy to provide for students with specific learning disabilities.
Title
Require each school district to adopt a policy to provide for students with specific learning disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 581 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 523 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 469 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-13 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 2. |
2017-02-13 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133ca |
2017-02-13 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133cb |
2017-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 228 |