SD HB1133 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require that a risk assessment is completed and reviewed before the release of a person charged with certain domestic crimes.
Title
Require that a risk assessment is completed and reviewed before the release of a person charged with certain domestic crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 640 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470 |
2016-02-17 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 411 |
2016-02-17 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133ra |
2016-02-17 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133ya |
2016-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 200 |