SD HB1133 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate vision care plans and vision discount plans.
Title
Regulate vision care plans and vision discount plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 423 |
2015-02-18 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133ra |
2015-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-11 | House | Commerce and Energy Deferred to another day, Passed |
2015-02-11 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 6. |
2015-02-11 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133ja |
2015-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 199 |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House H.J. 183 |