SD HB1130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding certain Class 2 misdemeanors.
Title
Revise provisions regarding certain Class 2 misdemeanors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 624 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 520 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 31. H.J. 534 |
2019-02-22 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 486 |
2019-02-22 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1130wb |
2019-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-20 | House | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1130wta |
2019-02-20 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1130wa |
2019-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 198 |