SD HB1130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the fee schedule for certain documents filed with the county register of deeds, to create a county and statewide fund for the purpose of modernizing and preserving records, and to distribute certain revenue.
Title
Revise the fee schedule for certain documents filed with the county register of deeds, to create a county and statewide fund for the purpose of modernizing and preserving records, and to distribute certain revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 661 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by President S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 543 | |
2012-02-22 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 497 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 367 | |
2012-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 12. H.J. 393 | |
2012-02-07 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 348 | |
2012-02-07 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1130fd | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-31 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 146 |