SD HB1130 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain adult children of overseas citizens to vote in the state.
Title
Allow certain adult children of overseas citizens to vote in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R] | Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Tom Hansen [R] |
Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Larry Lucas [D] | Rep. David Lust [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate State Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 741 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 688 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 632 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 632 Amendment 1130fa | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 547 | |
2011-02-28 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. Amendment 1130oc | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 451 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 400 | |
2011-02-14 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 384 | |
2011-02-09 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 332 | |
2011-02-09 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1130oa | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 148 |