SD HB1126 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish provisions that certain bonds paid by, or on behalf of, certain persons with child support arrearages shall be paid to the Department of Social Services to pay any child support the defendant owes.
Title
Establish provisions that certain bonds paid by, or on behalf of, certain persons with child support arrearages shall be paid to the Department of Social Services to pay any child support the defendant owes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 597 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 516 | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 438 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 472 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1126rta | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 447 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1126rf | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-10 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1126rb | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 145 |