SD HB1123 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the surcharge on certain hunting licenses for predator control purposes, approve temporary funding provisions relating to predator control, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Increase the surcharge on certain hunting licenses for predator control purposes, approve temporary funding provisions relating to predator control, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Intent to reconsider (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Intent to reconsider (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 843 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 753 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 750 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Intent to reconsider, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 749 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 745 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 8. S.J. 744 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 722 Amendment cc1123A |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 806 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 794 Amendment Cc1123A |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 770 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 765 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 701 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 675 Amendment 1123tta |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 675 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 674 Amendment 1123ta |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 622 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 327 |
2013-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 286 |
2013-01-31 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 266 |
2013-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 130 |