SD HB1121 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the definition of a pesticide dealer.
Title
Expand the definition of a pesticide dealer.
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Rep. Drew Peterson [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] |
Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. Scott Moore [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Tim Reisch [R] | Sen. Michael Rohl [R] | Rep. James Wangsness [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 499 |
2023-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2023 H.J. 420 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 361 |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 374 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 332 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 316 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 302 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 23 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 23 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 178 |
2023-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 200 |
2023-01-31 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 5 |
2023-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 102 |