SD HB1120 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Motion to strike the "Not", Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 42. H.J. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Motion to strike the "Not", Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 42. H.J. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require persons applying or receiving certain aid or assistance from the state to submit to drug and substances tests.
Title
Require persons applying or receiving certain aid or assistance from the state to submit to drug and substances tests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Motion to strike the "Not" (Y: 26 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Not Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Reconsidered (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) (Y: 24 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Not Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Reconsidered (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) (Y: 24 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Motion to strike the "Not", Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 42. H.J. 447 | |
2011-02-15 | Health and Human Services Do Not Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. | |
2011-02-15 | Health and Human Services Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. | |
2011-02-15 | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 391 | |
2011-02-01 | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 243 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 146 |