SD HB1119 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning mechanical pull-tab devices.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning mechanical pull-tab devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 452 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 385 | |
2012-02-10 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 361 | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 214 | |
2012-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 231 | |
2012-01-25 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 193 | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 144 |