SD HB1117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the licensing of historical motor vehicles.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the licensing of historical motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Transportation Do Pass, Passed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Transportation Do Pass, Passed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2018 H.J. 403 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 390 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 362 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 331 |
2018-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 254 |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 |
2018-01-25 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1117ja |
2018-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 128 |