SD HB1117 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 29, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 29, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions concerning the authorization for the use of other languages in public records or public meetings.
Title
Repeal certain provisions concerning the authorization for the use of other languages in public records or public meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Paula Hawks [D] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] |
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 29, 2016 H.J. 710 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 706 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 441 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 651 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 400 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 354 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 292 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 362 |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 340 |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 196 |