SD HB1116 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt bedding used for agricultural purposes from sales and use taxes.
Title
Exempt bedding used for agricultural purposes from sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Veto override (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Veto override (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 730 | |
2012-03-01 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 6. S.J. 651 | |
2012-03-01 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 710 | |
2012-02-29 | Vetoed by the Governor H.J. 687 | |
2012-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 587 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 511 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 538 | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 8. S.J. 472 | |
2012-02-15 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 433 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 278 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 11. H.J. 303 | |
2012-01-31 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 4. H.J. 257 | |
2012-01-31 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1116fa | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 143 |