SD HB1115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the deliberative process exception to certain open records provisions.
Title
Clarify the deliberative process exception to certain open records provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 581 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 557 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 263 |
2013-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 222 |
2013-01-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 178 |
2013-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 113 |