SD HB1114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend provision limiting the time used to determine if a violation is a third or subsequent offense.
Title
Amend provision limiting the time used to determine if a violation is a third or subsequent offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 563 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 588 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 504 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 479 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 278 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 305 | |
2012-02-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 271 | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 143 |