SD HB1113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit threats made with the intent to coerce an abortion and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Prohibit threats made with the intent to coerce an abortion and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689 |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 479 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 441 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 306 |
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 371 |
2022-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 349 |
2022-02-14 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 104 |