SD HB1113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the vehicles required to stop at a state weighing station.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the vehicles required to stop at a state weighing station.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Blaine Campbell [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] |
Rep. Michael Clark [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Steve Livermont [R] |
Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Rep. John Mills [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] |
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] |
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2018 H.J. 520 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 513 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 413 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 421 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 396 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 330 |
2018-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 255 |
2018-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-30 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 219 |
2018-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 127 |