SD HB1113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affect medical services.
Title
Affect medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 500 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 474 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 411 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 145 |