SD HB1112 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit any person who fails to file certain campaign finance documents to be a candidate for office.
Title
Prohibit any person who fails to file certain campaign finance documents to be a candidate for office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 242 | |
2012-01-26 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 230 | |
2012-01-25 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 192 | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 142 |