SD HB1111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 56-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for professional or occupational licensure for certain active duty military personnel and spouses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for professional or occupational licensure for certain active duty military personnel and spouses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 613
2019-03-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
2019-02-27SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 535
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 350
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 362
2019-02-06HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 321
2019-02-06HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. Amendment 1111cd
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 194

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1111&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1111P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1111HMV.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1111ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27873&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27874&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28118&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28951&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29183&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback