SD HB1108 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 29, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 29, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain municipal special assessment provisions and to provide for exclusion of territory from municipalities.
Title
Revise certain municipal special assessment provisions and to provide for exclusion of territory from municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Karen Soli [D] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] |
Sen. Scott Fiegen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 29, 2016 H.J. 710 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 706 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 441 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 651 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 400 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 354 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 292 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 362 |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 340 |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 182 |