SD HB1106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding support obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding support obligations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 500
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 7.
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 193

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback