SD HB1106 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize hunting preference points to be granted to persons age ten years or older.
Title
Authorize hunting preference points to be granted to persons age ten years or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 712 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 638 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 608 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 484 |
2018-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 10. H.J. 461 |
2018-02-13 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 416 |
2018-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 113 |