SD HB1106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a leased residential property classification.
Title
Create a leased residential property classification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 435 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378 |
2017-02-09 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 5. H.J. 357 |
2017-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-07 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 212 |