SD HB1106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Signed by Governor H.J. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Signed by Governor H.J. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain Limited Liability Company statutes.
Title
Revise certain Limited Liability Company statutes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] |
Sen. Corey Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 564 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 508 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 538 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 472 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 0. H.J. 432 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 415 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 370 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1106je |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 278 |
2013-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 |
2013-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 241 Amendment 1106jd |
2013-01-25 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 184 |
2013-01-25 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1106jc |
2013-01-25 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1106jb |
2013-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 111 |