SD HB1104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-9)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-9)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the arrest of certain victims of domestic abuse.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the arrest of certain victims of domestic abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 668 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 628 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 298 |
2018-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 229 |
2018-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 215 |
2018-01-24 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 165 |
2018-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 92 |