SD HB1102 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain definitions for sex offender registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain definitions for sex offender registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 467
2021-03-01SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 368
2021-02-25SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-09SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 225
2021-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 244
2021-02-05HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 1
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-27HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 139

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback