SD HB1101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-9)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-9)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensure the proper labeling of American Indian arts and crafts.
Title
Ensure the proper labeling of American Indian arts and crafts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370 |
2023-02-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2023 H.J. 330 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 293 |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 310 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 263 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 247 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 20 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 19 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 149 |
2023-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172 |
2023-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 165 |
2023-01-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2023-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 71 |