SD HB1101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensure local control over curriculum and methods of instruction.
Title
Ensure local control over curriculum and methods of instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 600 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 574 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 558 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 539 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 518 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 487 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 317 |
2015-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 315 |
2015-02-04 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 280 |
2015-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 159 |