SD HB1100 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to the video recording of certain victim testimony at a preliminary hearing or deposition.
Title
Revise provisions related to the video recording of certain victim testimony at a preliminary hearing or deposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 662 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 509 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 572 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 427 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1100B |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 233 |
2022-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 248 |
2022-02-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-07 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1100A |
2022-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 56 |