SD HB1100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to begin the research and development of a new bioprocessing facility and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to begin the research and development of a new bioprocessing facility and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 544 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 466 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 466 Amendment 1100C |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 |
2020-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 12. H.J. 390 |
2020-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 370 |
2020-02-20 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-20 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1100A |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 76 |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 62 |