SD HB1100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 40. H.J. 392
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 40. H.J. 392
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the number of ownership acres necessary to qualify for certain big game hunting licenses to be used on a landowner's own property.
Title
Revise the number of ownership acres necessary to qualify for certain big game hunting licenses to be used on a landowner's own property.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] |
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 40. H.J. 392 | |
2012-02-07 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 332 | |
2012-02-07 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1100ta | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 140 |