SD HB1099 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 35. H.J. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize counties to impose a temporary voter-approved half-cent sales and use tax and to issue revenue bonds to fund certain county infrastructure construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize counties to impose a temporary voter-approved half-cent sales and use tax and to issue revenue bonds to fund certain county infrastructure construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 35. H.J. 259
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 247
2020-02-06HouseTaxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
2020-02-06HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1099B
2020-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-28HouseReferred to House Taxation H.J. 74
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 60

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback