SD HB1099 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain campaign finance provisions.
Title
Revise certain campaign finance provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Karen Soli [D] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 527 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 500 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 452 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 666 |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 630 |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House Local Government, Passed H.J. 321 |
2016-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 163 |