SD HB1097 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize transportation activities by air ambulance operators.
Title
Authorize transportation activities by air ambulance operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364 |
2024-02-15 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 15, 2024 H.J. 340 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 330 |
2024-02-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 322 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 300 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 286 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 221 |
2024-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 200 |
2024-01-25 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2024-01-25 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1097C |
2024-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-23 | House | Health and Human Services Deferred to another day, Passed |
2024-01-23 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. |
2024-01-23 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1097A |
2024-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 73 |