SD HB1097 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modify requirements for a marriage license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify requirements for a marriage license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateSigned by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480
2020-03-02SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 436
2020-02-27SenateSigned by the President S.J. 375
2020-02-26SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 415
2020-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 338
2020-02-24SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2020-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 189
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 241
2020-02-06HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-02-06HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2020-02-06HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1097B
2020-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-28HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 76
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 62

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback