SD HB1097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding magistrate court jurisdiction over vulnerable adult protective or restraining orders.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding magistrate court jurisdiction over vulnerable adult protective or restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2018 H.J. 596 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 588 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 540 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 505 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 478 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 271 |
2018-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 209 |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-24 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 165 |
2018-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 77 |