SD HB1096 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a penalty for sexual contact with a minor by a person holding a position of authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a penalty for sexual contact with a minor by a person holding a position of authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2021-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 434
2021-03-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-03-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 365
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 424
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 424 Amendment 1096B
2021-02-24HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
2021-02-24HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1096A
2021-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-27HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 139

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback