SD HB1096 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 169
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit commercial surrogacy contracts, provide a penalty for facilitating a commercial surrogacy, and establish an interim committee to evaluate surrogacy in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit commercial surrogacy contracts, provide a penalty for facilitating a commercial surrogacy, and establish an interim committee to evaluate surrogacy in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 169
2020-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed Amendment 1096J
2020-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 20. H.J. 215
2020-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 21. H.J. 213 Amendment 1096H
2020-02-04HouseDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed H.J. 119
2020-01-29HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
2020-01-29HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096C
2020-01-29HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096B
2020-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-27HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 61

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback