SD HB1096 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a criminal penalty for any person who prevents the enforcement of a secured creditor's security interest upon repossession of a motor vehicle.
Title
Provide for a criminal penalty for any person who prevents the enforcement of a secured creditor's security interest upon repossession of a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. John Lake [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Sen. Terri Haverly [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 582 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096bc |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096bb |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 356 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 11. H.J. 348 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337 |
2017-02-03 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 290 |
2017-02-03 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096ba |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 193 |