SD HB1096 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain procedures for issuing a permit to carry a concealed pistol.
Title
Revise certain procedures for issuing a permit to carry a concealed pistol.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] |
Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Rep. Leslie Heinemann [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] |
Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] |
Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 487 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 317 |
2015-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 15. H.J. 309 |
2015-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 308 Amendment 1096ya |
2015-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 275 |
2015-01-30 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 240 |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 158 |