SD HB1096 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions relating to the appointment of municipal officers.
Title
Repeal certain provisions relating to the appointment of municipal officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Signed by Governor H.J. 650 | |
2011-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 515 | |
2011-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 484 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 470 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-16 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 443 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 318 | |
2011-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 266 | |
2011-02-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-01 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 244 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 142 |