SD HB1096 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the penalty for an open burning violation in the Black Hills Forest Fire Protection District.
Title
Revise the penalty for an open burning violation in the Black Hills Forest Fire Protection District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Signed by Governor H.J. 612 | |
2010-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 424 | |
2010-02-19 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 376 | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 326 | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 279 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 328 | |
2010-02-04 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 308 | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 146 |