SD HB1094 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding permits for concealed pistols.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding permits for concealed pistols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 H.J. 538 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 419 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 189 |
2020-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 247 |
2020-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 232 |
2020-02-06 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 76 |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 62 |