SD HB1094 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit a person from interfering with a public safety answering point.
Title
Prohibit a person from interfering with a public safety answering point.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 305 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 225 |
2014-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 12. H.J. 280 |
2014-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 254 |
2014-01-30 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 171 |
2014-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 102 |