SD HB1094 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require the filing of certain documents relating to the vacation, location, or changing of highways with the register of deeds.
Title
Require the filing of certain documents relating to the vacation, location, or changing of highways with the register of deeds.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Abdallah [R] | Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] |
Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] | Sen. Eldon Nygaard [D] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Signed by Governor H.J. 454 | |
2012-02-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 422 | |
2012-02-09 | Signed by President S.J. 345 | |
2012-02-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 366 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 301 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-06 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 274 | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 231 | |
2012-01-30 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 249 | |
2012-01-26 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 215 | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 69 |