SD HB1094 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Subject the gross receipts of contractors engaged in realty improvement contracts for certain municipal utilities to the contractor's excise tax instead of the alternative contractor's excise tax and to declare an emergency.
Title
Subject the gross receipts of contractors engaged in realty improvement contracts for certain municipal utilities to the contractor's excise tax instead of the alternative contractor's excise tax and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Hansen [R] | Rep. Patrick Kirschman [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Thomas Nelson [R] |
Rep. Ryan Olson [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Signed by Governor H.J. 612 | |
2010-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-19 | Signed by President S.J. 390 | |
2010-02-18 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 476 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 357 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 341 | |
2010-02-12 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 318 | |
2010-02-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 230 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 274 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 252 | |
2010-01-28 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 210 | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 145 |