SD HB1090 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding the exercise of certain powers over certain property.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding the exercise of certain powers over certain property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy Removed from table (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy Removed from table (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 681 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 710 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 645 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 622 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 520 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 519 |
2019-02-22 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed H.J. 477 Amendment 1090wta |
2019-02-22 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-22 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1090ya |
2019-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-20 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1090wa |
2019-02-20 | House | Commerce and Energy Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. |
2019-02-11 | House | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 352 |
2019-02-11 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 9. |
2019-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 190 |