SD HB1090 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Define certain fees incident to the extension of credit.
Title
Define certain fees incident to the extension of credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 710 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 716 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 667 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 637 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 616 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 555 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 503 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-15 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 403 |
2017-02-15 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1090db |
2017-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-13 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 191 |